MI HB5488 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-08 - Assigned Pa 254'22
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-08 - Assigned Pa 254'22
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health occupations: psychologists; individuals who are authorized to engage in the practice of psychology in this state; modify to include individuals who are authorized to practice under the psychology interjurisdictional compact. Amends secs. 16317, 16343 & 18201 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.16317 et seq.) & adds sec. 18211a.
Title
Health occupations: psychologists; individuals who are authorized to engage in the practice of psychology in this state; modify to include individuals who are authorized to practice under the psychology interjurisdictional compact. Amends secs. 16317, 16343 & 18201 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.16317 et seq.) & adds sec. 18211a.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-09 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 603 (Y: 95 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-09 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 603 (Y: 95 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-08 | House | Assigned Pa 254'22 |
2022-12-08 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/22/2022 04:04 Pm |
2022-12-08 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/22/2022 02:18 Pm |
2022-12-08 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/13/2022 11:10 Am |
2022-12-08 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2022-12-08 | House | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2022-12-08 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 507 Yeas 82 Nays 15 Excused 0 Not Voting 12 |
2022-12-08 | House | Senate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2022-12-07 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2022-12-07 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Title Amendment |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Title Amended |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 541 Yeas 31 Nays 0 Excused 7 Not Voting 0 |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2021-12-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services |
2021-12-09 | House | Transmitted |
2021-12-09 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 603 Yeas 95 Nays 7 Excused 0 Not Voting 5 |
2021-12-09 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-12-08 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-12-08 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-12-02 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-12-02 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-11-02 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/28/2021 |
2021-10-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2021-10-28 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-10-28 | House | Introduced By Representative Bronna Kahle |
Subjects
Health occupations: psychologists
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
State: interstate compacts and agreements
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
State: interstate compacts and agreements