MI HB5355 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Liquor; manufacturer; requirement for manufacturer or wholesaler to provide proof of valid label from United States Alcohol and Tobacco Tax and Trade Bureau; eliminate under certain circumstances. Amends sec. 609a of 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1609a). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5353'19, HB 5347'19, HB 5342'19, HB 5348'19, HB 5345'19, HB 5400'19, HB 5354'19, HB 5344'19, HB 5341'19, HB 5349'19, HB 5352'19, HB 5351'19, HB 5350'19, HB 5346'19, HB 5343'19

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Liquor; manufacturer; requirement for manufacturer or wholesaler to provide proof of valid label from United States Alcohol and Tobacco Tax and Trade Bureau; eliminate under certain circumstances. Amends sec. 609a of 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1609a). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5353'19, HB 5347'19, HB 5342'19, HB 5348'19, HB 5345'19, HB 5400'19, HB 5354'19, HB 5344'19, HB 5341'19, HB 5349'19, HB 5352'19, HB 5351'19, HB 5350'19, HB 5346'19, HB 5343'19

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 102 (Y: 103 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-09SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2020-06-09SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2020-06-09SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2020-02-25SenateReferred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
2020-02-20HouseTransmitted
2020-02-20HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 102 Yeas 103 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 5
2020-02-20HouseRead A Third Time
2020-02-19HousePlaced On Third Reading
2020-02-19HouseSubstitute (h-1) Adopted
2020-02-19HouseRead A Second Time
2020-02-19HouseReferred To Second Reading
2020-02-19HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
2020-02-04HouseReferred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1)
2020-01-21HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 01/21/2020
2020-01-16HouseReferred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
2020-01-16HouseRead A First Time
2020-01-16HouseIntroduced By Representative Sara Cambensy

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback