MI HB5333 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-31 - Assigned Pa 287'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-31 - Assigned Pa 287'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Natural resources: forests; use of money in the forest development fund; prohibit for certain administrative costs and payments in lieu of taxes. Amends secs. 50501, 50502, 50507 & 53503 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.50501 et seq.).
Title
Natural resources: forests; use of money in the forest development fund; prohibit for certain administrative costs and payments in lieu of taxes. Amends secs. 50501, 50502, 50507 & 53503 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.50501 et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 483 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 136 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 136 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 287'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/29/2020 01:46 Pm |
2020-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/29/2020 09:56 Am |
2020-12-16 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/16/2020 09:04 Am |
2020-12-10 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2020-12-10 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-12-10 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 483 Yeas 36 Nays 1 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2020-03-04 | House | Transmitted |
2020-03-04 | House | Title Amended |
2020-03-04 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 136 Yeas 106 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2020-03-04 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2020-03-03 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-02-25 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-02-25 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1) |
2020-01-16 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/16/2020 |
2020-01-15 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources And Outdoor Recreation |
2020-01-15 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-01-15 | House | Introduced By Representative Gregory Markkanen |