MI HB5304 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-6)
Status: Introduced on November 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic control: traffic regulation; requirement to drive in the right-hand lane of a roadway with 2 lanes for travel in 1 direction; modify. Amends sec. 634 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.634).
Title
Traffic control: traffic regulation; requirement to drive in the right-hand lane of a roadway with 2 lanes for travel in 1 direction; modify. Amends sec. 634 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.634).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2024-04-23 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2023-11-07 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 11/03/2023 |
2023-11-03 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation, Mobility And Infrastructure |
2023-11-03 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-11-03 | House | Introduced By Representative William Bruck |