MI HB5296 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Assigned Pa 32'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Assigned Pa 32'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Businesses: professional corporations; formation of professional corporations by chiropractic physician groups; allow. Amends sec. 284 of 1972 PA 284 (MCL 450.1284).
Title
Businesses: professional corporations; formation of professional corporations by chiropractic physician groups; allow. Amends sec. 284 of 1972 PA 284 (MCL 450.1284).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 49 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 585 (Y: 99 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 585 (Y: 99 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Assigned Pa 32'22 With Immediate Effect |
2022-03-15 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 03/15/2022 11:44 Am |
2022-03-15 | House | Approved By The Governor 03/15/2022 11:04 Am |
2022-03-03 | House | Presented To The Governor 03/03/2022 02:58 Pm |
2022-03-02 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2022-03-02 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2022-03-02 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 49 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2021-12-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Economic And Small Business Development |
2021-12-07 | House | Transmitted |
2021-12-07 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 585 Yeas 99 Nays 4 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2021-12-07 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-12-02 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-12-02 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-11-09 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-11-09 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-09-14 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/14/2021 |
2021-09-14 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2021-09-14 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-09-14 | House | Introduced By Representative Kevin Hertel |
Subjects
Businesses: professional corporations
Health occupations: chiropractors
Occupations: business licensing and registration
Health occupations: chiropractors
Occupations: business licensing and registration