MI HB5289 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on September 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-21 - Notice Given To Discharge Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-21 - Notice Given To Discharge Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Crimes: abortion; penalty for administering with intent to procure miscarriage; repeal. Repeals sec. 14 of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.14).
Title
Crimes: abortion; penalty for administering with intent to procure miscarriage; repeal. Repeals sec. 14 of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.14).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-21 | House | Notice Given To Discharge Committee |
2022-09-21 | House | Motion To Discharge Committee Postponed For Day |
2022-06-30 | House | Motion To Discharge Committee Rejected |
2022-06-29 | House | Notice Given To Discharge Committee |
2022-06-15 | House | Notice Given To Discharge Committee |
2021-09-14 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/14/2021 |
2021-09-14 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2021-09-14 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-09-14 | House | Introduced By Representative Kyra Bolden |
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2021-HB-5289 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billintroduced/House/htm/2021-HIB-5289.htm |