MI HB5226 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 407'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 407'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Natural resources; hunting; issuance of crop damage permits; expand to include bear. Amends sec. 40114 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.40114).
Title
Natural resources; hunting; issuance of crop damage permits; expand to include bear. Amends sec. 40114 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.40114).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-17 - House - House Third Reading: Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 689 (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 783 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 355 (Y: 103 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 783 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 355 (Y: 103 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 407'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/30/2014 @ 11:35 Am 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/27/2014 @ 8:40 Pm 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-30 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/23/2014 @ 9:44 Am |
2014-12-17 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2014-12-17 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2014-12-17 | House | Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 689 Yeas 105 Nays 4 |
2014-12-16 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2014-12-16 | House | Returned From Senate With Amendment(s) With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2014-12-15 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2014-12-15 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 783 Yeas 37 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2014-12-11 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Amendment(s) |
2014-12-11 | Senate | Amendment(s) Concurred In |
2014-12-11 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Amendment(s) |
2014-10-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2014-10-22 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-10-22 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Agriculture |
2014-06-05 | House | Transmitted |
2014-06-05 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 355 Yeas 103 Nays 5 |
2014-06-05 | House | Amended |
2014-06-05 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-05-28 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-05-28 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2014-05-28 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-05-21 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-05-21 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2014-01-22 | House | Printed Bill Filed 01/22/2014 |
2014-01-21 | House | Referred To Committee On Agriculture |
2014-01-21 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-01-21 | House | Introduced By Representative Ed Mcbroom |
Subjects
Animals, game
Animals, other
Natural resources, hunting
Natural resources, wildlife
State agencies (existing), natural resources
Animals, other
Natural resources, hunting
Natural resources, wildlife
State agencies (existing), natural resources