MI HB5198 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 527'14 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 527'14 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Labor; mediation; access to certain case files for use in human services employee disciplinary proceedings; allow without a court order. Amends sec. 7 of 1975 PA 238 (MCL 722.627).
Title
Labor; mediation; access to certain case files for use in human services employee disciplinary proceedings; allow without a court order. Amends sec. 7 of 1975 PA 238 (MCL 722.627).
Sponsors
Rep. Michael McCready [R] | Rep. Kenneth Kurtz [R] | Rep. Gail Haines [R] | Rep. Hugh Crawford [R] |
Sen. Peter MacGregor [R] | Rep. Eileen Kowall [R] | Rep. Klint Kesto [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-12-19 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 800 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 911 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 35 (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 911 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 35 (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 527'14 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/14/2015 @ 3:47 Pm 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 1/10/2015 @ 4:08 Pm 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Presented To The Governor 1/5/2015 @ 3:54 Pm 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-19 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2014-12-19 | House | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2014-12-19 | House | Roll Call # 800 Yeas 110 Nays 0 |
2014-12-19 | House | Senate Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2014-12-19 | House | Rule Suspended |
2014-12-19 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2014-12-19 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-2 With Title Amendment |
2014-12-19 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2014-12-19 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2014-12-19 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 911 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2014-12-19 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Adopted |
2014-12-16 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2014-12-16 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2014-12-16 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Human Services |
2014-02-11 | House | Transmitted |
2014-02-11 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 35 Yeas 108 Nays 1 |
2014-02-11 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-02-05 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-02-05 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-01-29 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-01-29 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2013-12-13 | House | Printed Bill Filed 12/13/2013 |
2013-12-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2013-12-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-12-12 | House | Introduced By Representative Michael Mccready |
Subjects
Children, abuse or neglect
Human services, other
Labor, arbitration
Labor, mediation
Records, other
State agencies (existing), human services
Human services, other
Labor, arbitration
Labor, mediation
Records, other
State agencies (existing), human services