MI HB5198 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on December 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-15 - Assigned Pa 266'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on December 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-15 - Assigned Pa 266'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Liquor; licenses; provision regarding furnishing alcoholic beverages to a minor; revise penalties. Amends sec. 701 of 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1701). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5199'09
Title
Liquor; licenses; provision regarding furnishing alcoholic beverages to a minor; revise penalties. Amends sec. 701 of 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1701). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5199'09
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-09-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-15 | Assigned Pa 266'10 With Immediate Effect | |
2010-12-15 | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/14/2010 @ 2:24 Pm | |
2010-12-15 | Approved By The Governor 12/14/2010 @ 11:26 Am | |
2010-12-15 | Presented To The Governor 12/9/2010 @ 1:08 Pm | |
2010-12-02 | Bill Ordered Enrolled | |
2010-12-02 | Full Title Agreed To | |
2010-12-02 | Roll Call # 548 Yeas 75 Nays 18 | |
2010-12-02 | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In | |
2010-12-02 | Rule Suspended | |
2010-12-02 | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules | |
2010-12-02 | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Full Title | |
2010-12-02 | Inserted Full Title | |
2010-12-02 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 616 Yeas 34 Nays 2 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 | |
2010-12-01 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 | |
2010-12-01 | Substitute S-1 Concurred In | |
2010-12-01 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 | |
2010-09-21 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 | |
2010-09-21 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2010-09-21 | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 | |
2010-04-29 | Referred To Committee On Economic Development And Regulatory Reform | |
2010-04-28 | Transmitted | |
2010-04-28 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 157 Yeas 93 Nays 11 | |
2010-04-28 | Read A Third Time | |
2010-04-28 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-04-28 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2010-04-28 | Substitute H-1 Adopted | |
2010-04-28 | Read A Second Time | |
2010-03-25 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2010-03-25 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 | |
2009-07-15 | Printed Bill Filed 07/15/2009 | |
2009-07-14 | Referred To Committee On Transportation | |
2009-07-14 | Read A First Time | |
2009-07-14 | Introduced By Representative Harold Haugh |