MI HB5192 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-30 - Assigned Pa 392'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-30 - Assigned Pa 392'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance; life; use of certain preferred class structure mortality tables; allow under certain conditions. Amends sec. 838a of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.838a).
Title
Insurance; life; use of certain preferred class structure mortality tables; allow under certain conditions. Amends sec. 838a of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.838a).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 803 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 189 (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 189 (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-30 | House | Assigned Pa 392'14 With Immediate Effect |
2014-12-30 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/22/2014 @ 3:38 Pm |
2014-12-30 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/18/2014 @ 8:56 Pm |
2014-12-16 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2014-12-16 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2014-12-16 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2014-12-16 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2014-12-16 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 803 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2014-12-15 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2014-12-15 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Insurance |
2014-04-17 | House | Transmitted |
2014-04-17 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 189 Yeas 106 Nays 1 |
2014-04-17 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-03-27 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-03-27 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-03-20 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-03-20 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2013-12-12 | House | Printed Bill Filed 12/11/2013 |
2013-12-11 | House | Referred To Committee On Insurance |
2013-12-11 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-12-11 | House | Introduced By Representative Andrea Lafontaine |