MI HB5190 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-28 - Assigned Pa 276'11 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-28 - Assigned Pa 276'11 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public utilities; rates; collection for low-income and energy efficiency fund; eliminate. Amends sec. 10d of 1939 PA 3 (MCL 460.10d).
Title
Public utilities; rates; collection for low-income and energy efficiency fund; eliminate. Amends sec. 10d of 1939 PA 3 (MCL 460.10d).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-12-15 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 618 (Y: 100 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 840 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-07 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 529 (Y: 62 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 840 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-07 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 529 (Y: 62 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-28 | House | Assigned Pa 276'11 With Immediate Effect |
2011-12-28 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/20/2011 @ 1:24 Pm |
2011-12-28 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/20/2011 @ 12:52 Pm |
2011-12-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/20/2011 @ 9:28 Am |
2011-12-15 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2011-12-15 | House | Roll Call # 618 Yeas 100 Nays 6 |
2011-12-15 | House | Senate Substitute S-3 Concurred In |
2011-12-15 | House | Rule Suspended |
2011-12-15 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2011-12-15 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-3 With Immediate Effect |
2011-12-15 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 840 Yeas 36 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2011-12-15 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2011-12-15 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2011-12-15 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-3 As Amended |
2011-12-15 | Senate | Substitute S-3 As Amended Concurred In |
2011-12-15 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-3 And Amendment(s) |
2011-12-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2011-12-08 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2011-12-07 | House | Transmitted |
2011-12-07 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 529 Yeas 62 Nays 46 |
2011-12-07 | House | Read A Third Time |
2011-12-07 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2011-12-07 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2011-12-07 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted And Amended |
2011-12-07 | House | Read A Second Time |
2011-12-06 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2011-12-06 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2011-12-01 | House | Printed Bill Filed 12/01/2011 |
2011-11-30 | House | Referred To Committee On Energy And Technology |
2011-11-30 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-11-30 | House | Introduced By Representative Ken Horn |