MI HB5142 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-15 - Assigned Pa 266'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

School aid; other; requirement to employ certificated teachers for the purposes of school aid; modify. Amends secs. 6 & 163 of 1979 PA 94 (MCL 388.1606 & 388.1763). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5141'17

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School aid; other; requirement to employ certificated teachers for the purposes of school aid; modify. Amends secs. 6 & 163 of 1979 PA 94 (MCL 388.1606 & 388.1763). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5141'17

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 549 (Y: 72 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 504 (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 448 (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 505 (Y: 74 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-15HouseAssigned Pa 266'18 With Immediate Effect
2018-08-15HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 6/28/2018 @ 4:24 Pm
2018-08-15HouseApproved By The Governor 6/28/2018 @ 2:43 Pm
2018-08-15HousePresented To The Governor 6/25/2018 @ 1:50 Pm
2018-06-12HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2018-06-12HouseFull Title Agreed To
2018-06-12House Roll Call # 549 Yeas 72 Nays 37
2018-06-12HouseSenate Substitute S-1 Concurred In
2018-06-12HouseRule Suspended
2018-06-12HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2018-06-12HouseReturned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2018-06-12SenatePassed Roll Call # 504 Yeas 25 Nays 11 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2018-06-12SenateSubstitute S-1 Adopted
2018-06-12SenateVote Reconsidered
2018-06-12HouseRequest Granted
2018-06-12HouseSenate Requests Return
2018-06-12SenateSenate Requests Return
2018-06-12HouseReturned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2018-06-12SenateInserted Full Title
2018-06-12SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 448 Yeas 25 Nays 11 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2018-06-12SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2018-06-12SenateRules Suspended
2018-06-12SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2018-06-12SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2018-06-12SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2018-06-12SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2018-06-12SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2018-01-10SenateReferred To Committee On Economic Development And International Investment
2017-12-13HouseTransmitted
2017-12-13HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 505 Yeas 74 Nays 36
2017-12-13HouseRead A Third Time
2017-12-13HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2017-12-13HousePlaced On Third Reading
2017-12-13HouseRead A Second Time
2017-12-12HouseReferred To Second Reading
2017-12-12HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2017-10-24HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 10/19/2017
2017-10-19HouseReferred To Committee On Workforce And Talent Development
2017-10-19HouseRead A First Time
2017-10-19HouseIntroduced By Representative Robert Kosowski

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2017-HB-5142
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/House/htm/2017-HIB-5142.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2017-HEBH-5142.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2017-HEBS-5142.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/House/htm/2017-HNB-5142.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/publicact/htm/2018-PA-0266.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2017-HJ-12-12-096.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2017-HJ-12-13-097.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-06-12-060.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-06-12-059.htm

Bill Comments

feedback