MI HB5090 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-02 - Printed Bill Filed 12/02/2015
Pending: House Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 1 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-02 - Printed Bill Filed 12/02/2015
Pending: House Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Health occupations; physicians; continuing certification requirements for physicians; prohibit as basis for license or renewal or for hospital admitting privileges. Amends 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.1101 - 333.25211) by adding secs. 16147 & 21514.
Title
Health occupations; physicians; continuing certification requirements for physicians; prohibit as basis for license or renewal or for hospital admitting privileges. Amends 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.1101 - 333.25211) by adding secs. 16147 & 21514.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-02 | House | Printed Bill Filed 12/02/2015 |
2015-12-01 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2015-12-01 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-12-01 | House | Introduced By Representative Edward Canfield |
Same As/Similar To
SB0609 (Same As) 2015-11-10 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy
Subjects
Health facilities: hospitals
Health occupations: physicians
Occupations: individual licensing and regulation
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
Health occupations: physicians
Occupations: individual licensing and regulation
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2015-HB-5090 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2015-2016/billintroduced/House/htm/2015-HIB-5090.htm |