MI HB5078 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Transmitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Transmitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Health: pharmaceuticals; distribution of opioid antagonists by employees and agents of agencies under the administration of opioid antagonists act; provide for. Amends sec. 17744b of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.17744b). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5077'23
Title
Health: pharmaceuticals; distribution of opioid antagonists by employees and agents of agencies under the administration of opioid antagonists act; provide for. Amends sec. 17744b of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.17744b). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5077'23
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 40 (Y: 96 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Transmitted |
2024-04-24 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 40 Yeas 96 Nays 11 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2024-04-24 | House | Read A Third Time |
2024-04-18 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2024-04-18 | House | Read A Second Time |
2024-03-06 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2024-03-06 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2023-10-04 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/03/2023 |
2023-10-03 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2023-10-03 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-10-03 | House | Introduced By Representative Carrie Rheingans |
Same As/Similar To
HB5077 (Same As) 2024-04-24 - Transmitted