MI HB5074 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-14 - Re-referred To Committee On Tax Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-14 - Re-referred To Committee On Tax Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Use tax; exemptions; property exemption for data centers; provide for. Amends sec. 14b of 1937 PA 94 (MCL 205.104b).
Title
Use tax; exemptions; property exemption for data centers; provide for. Amends sec. 14b of 1937 PA 94 (MCL 205.104b).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-12-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-14 | House | Re-referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2015-12-02 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2015-12-02 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2015-12-01 | House | Printed Bill Filed 11/12/2015 |
2015-11-10 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2015-11-10 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-11-10 | House | Introduced By Representative Rob Verheulen |
Same As/Similar To
SB0617 (Same As) 2015-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0252'15 With Immediate Effect