MI SB0617 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0252'15 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0252'15 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Use tax; exemptions; exemption for certain data center equipment; provide for. Amends sec. 14b of 1937 PA 94 (MCL 205.104b) & adds sec. 4cc.
Title
Use tax; exemptions; exemption for certain data center equipment; provide for. Amends sec. 14b of 1937 PA 94 (MCL 205.104b) & adds sec. 4cc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-12-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 628 (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-15 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 488 (Y: 61 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 543 (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-12-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-15 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 488 (Y: 61 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 543 (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-12-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0252'15 With Immediate Effect |
2015-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/23/2015 @ 2:40 Pm |
2015-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/23/2015 @ 9:12 Am |
2015-12-31 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/22/2015 @ 5:06 Pm 2015 Addenda |
2015-12-15 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-12-15 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2015-12-15 | Senate | Roll Call # 628 Yeas 26 Nays 12 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2015-12-15 | Senate | House Substitute H-2 Concurred In |
2015-12-15 | House | Returned To Senate |
2015-12-15 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2015-12-15 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 488 Yeas 61 Nays 45 |
2015-12-15 | House | Read A Third Time |
2015-12-15 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2015-12-15 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2015-12-15 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted And Amended |
2015-12-15 | House | Substitute H-1 Not Adopted |
2015-12-15 | House | Read A Second Time |
2015-12-09 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2015-12-09 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2015-12-03 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2015-12-03 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-12-03 | House | Received On 12/03/2015 |
2015-12-03 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 543 Yeas 21 Nays 15 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2015-12-03 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2015-12-03 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2015-12-03 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 As Amended |
2015-12-03 | Senate | Substitute S-1 As Amended Concurred In |
2015-12-03 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 And Amendment(s) |
2015-12-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2015-12-03 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2015-12-03 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2015-11-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Michigan Competitiveness |
2015-11-10 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Peter Macgregor |
Same As/Similar To
HB5074 (Same As) 2016-01-14 - Re-referred To Committee On Tax Policy