MI HB5050 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-24 - Assigned Pa 104'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-24 - Assigned Pa 104'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Law enforcement; investigations; providing false information to peace officer conducting criminal investigation; prohibit, and provide penalties. Amends 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.1 - 750.568) by adding sec. 479c.
Title
Law enforcement; investigations; providing false information to peace officer conducting criminal investigation; prohibit, and provide penalties. Amends 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.1 - 750.568) by adding sec. 479c.
Sponsors
Rep. John Walsh [R] | Rep. Matthew Lori [R] | Rep. Lisa Lyons [R] | Rep. Harold Haugh [D] |
Rep. Kurt Heise [R] | Sen. Wayne Schmidt [R] | Rep. Marilyn Lane [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 149 (Y: 105 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 156 (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 39 (Y: 100 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 156 (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 39 (Y: 100 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-24 | House | Assigned Pa 104'12 With Immediate Effect |
2012-04-24 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 4/20/2012 @ 10:46 Am |
2012-04-24 | House | Approved By The Governor 4/18/2012 @ 1:07 Pm |
2012-04-17 | House | Presented To The Governor 4/9/2012 @ 2:16 Pm |
2012-03-29 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2012-03-29 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-03-29 | House | Roll Call # 149 Yeas 105 Nays 4 |
2012-03-29 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2012-03-27 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2012-03-27 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 156 Yeas 32 Nays 5 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Amendment(s) Adopted |
2012-03-21 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2012-03-21 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2012-03-21 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2012-02-08 | House | Transmitted |
2012-02-08 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 39 Yeas 100 Nays 3 |
2012-02-08 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-02-07 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-02-07 | House | Substitute H-4 Adopted |
2012-02-07 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-02-02 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-02-02 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 |
2011-10-12 | House | Printed Bill Filed 10/12/2011 |
2011-10-11 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2011-10-11 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-10-11 | House | Introduced By Representative John Walsh |