MI HB5044 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Assigned Pa 56'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Assigned Pa 56'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Children; foster care; citation to mental health code definition; revise. Amends sec. 4c of 1994 PA 203 (MCL 722.954c). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5043'19
Title
Children; foster care; citation to mental health code definition; revise. Amends sec. 4c of 1994 PA 203 (MCL 722.954c). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5043'19
Sponsors
Rep. Latanya Garrett [D] | Rep. Mary Whiteford [R] | Rep. Tommy Brann [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Yaroch [R] |
Rep. Kathy Crawford [R] | Rep. Henry Vaupel [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 73 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-06 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 316 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-06 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 316 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Assigned Pa 56'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-03-04 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 03/03/2020 04:24 Pm |
2020-03-04 | House | Approved By The Governor 03/03/2020 12:59 Pm |
2020-02-25 | House | Presented To The Governor 02/25/2020 11:46 Am |
2020-02-19 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2019-11-06 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-02-19 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 73 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services |
2019-11-06 | House | Transmitted |
2019-11-06 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 316 Yeas 110 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2019-11-06 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-11-05 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-11-05 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-10-22 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-10-22 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2019-10-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2019-10-10 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/08/2019 |
2019-10-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2019-10-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-10-08 | House | Introduced By Representative Latanya Garrett |