MI HB4986 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-11 - Assigned Pa 136'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-11 - Assigned Pa 136'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Economic development; neighborhood enterprise zones; eligibility; revise for certain residents. Amends sec. 4 of 1992 PA 147 (MCL 207.774).
Title
Economic development; neighborhood enterprise zones; eligibility; revise for certain residents. Amends sec. 4 of 1992 PA 147 (MCL 207.774).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-27 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-11 | Assigned Pa 136'10 With Immediate Effect | |
2010-08-11 | Filed With Secretary Of State 8/4/2010 @ 3:20 Pm | |
2010-08-11 | Approved By The Governor 8/3/2010 @ 5:00 Pm | |
2010-07-28 | Presented To The Governor 7/26/2010 @ 3:53 Pm | |
2010-07-21 | Bill Ordered Enrolled | |
2010-07-21 | Title Amendment Agreed To | |
2010-07-21 | Roll Call # 344 Yeas 71 Nays 33 | |
2010-07-21 | Senate Substitute S-4 Concurred In | |
2010-06-29 | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules | |
2010-06-29 | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-4 With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment | |
2010-06-29 | Inserted Full Title | |
2010-06-29 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 337 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 | |
2010-06-24 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-4 | |
2010-06-24 | Substitute S-4 Concurred In | |
2010-06-24 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-4 | |
2010-05-27 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-3 | |
2010-05-27 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2010-05-27 | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 | |
2010-03-11 | Referred To Committee On Commerce And Tourism | |
2010-03-10 | Transmitted | |
2010-03-10 | Title Amended | |
2010-03-10 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 65 Yeas 74 Nays 33 | |
2010-03-10 | Read A Third Time | |
2010-03-10 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-03-10 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2010-03-10 | Substitute H-3 Adopted | |
2010-03-10 | Substitute H-2 Not Adopted | |
2010-03-10 | Read A Second Time | |
2010-02-10 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2010-02-10 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 | |
2009-06-17 | Recommendation Concurred In | |
2009-06-17 | Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Commerce | |
2009-05-27 | Printed Bill Filed 05/27/2009 | |
2009-05-26 | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy | |
2009-05-26 | Read A First Time | |
2009-05-26 | Introduced By Representative Coleman Young |