MI HB4985 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-18)
Status: Engrossed on November 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-11-07 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety
Pending: Senate Judiciary And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Criminal procedure; records; expungement of multiple felonies arising out of the same criminal transaction; allow under certain circumstances. Amends sec. 1 of 1965 PA 213 (MCL 780.621). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4981'19, HB 5120'19, HB 4984'19, HB 4983'19, HB 4980'19, HB 4982'19

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal procedure; records; expungement of multiple felonies arising out of the same criminal transaction; allow under certain circumstances. Amends sec. 1 of 1965 PA 213 (MCL 780.621). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4981'19, HB 5120'19, HB 4984'19, HB 4983'19, HB 4980'19, HB 4982'19

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-11-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 310 (Y: 98 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-07SenateReferred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety
2019-11-05HouseTransmitted
2019-11-05HouseTitle Amended
2019-11-05HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 310 Yeas 98 Nays 10 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
2019-11-05HouseRead A Third Time
2019-11-05HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2019-11-05HousePlaced On Third Reading
2019-11-05HouseSubstitute (h-1) Adopted
2019-11-05HouseRead A Second Time
2019-10-29HouseReferred To Second Reading
2019-10-29HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
2019-09-18HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 09/18/2019
2019-09-17HouseReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2019-09-17HouseRead A First Time
2019-09-17HouseIntroduced By Representative Sherry Gay-dagnogo

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback