MI HB4984 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-09 - Assigned Pa 151'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-09 - Assigned Pa 151'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Property tax; other; specific tax levied under the tax reverted clean title act; revise. Amends sec. 5 of 2003 PA 260 (MCL 211.1025).
Title
Property tax; other; specific tax levied under the tax reverted clean title act; revise. Amends sec. 5 of 2003 PA 260 (MCL 211.1025).
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Barrett [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 314 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 148 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 148 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-09 | House | Assigned Pa 151'16 With Immediate Effect |
2016-06-09 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/9/2016 @ 1:32 Pm |
2016-06-09 | House | Approved By The Governor 6/8/2016 @ 2:20 Pm |
2016-06-01 | House | Presented To The Governor 5/31/2016 @ 12:04 Pm |
2016-05-24 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2016-05-24 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2016-05-24 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 314 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2016-04-12 | House | Transmitted |
2016-04-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 148 Yeas 108 Nays 0 |
2016-04-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-03-24 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-03-24 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-03-09 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-03-09 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2015-10-14 | House | Printed Bill Filed 10/14/2015 |
2015-10-13 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2015-10-13 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-10-13 | House | Introduced By Representative Tom Barrett |