MI HB4975 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 505'12 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 505'12 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Occupations; appraisers; appraisal management companies; regulate. Amends sec. 602 of 1980 PA 299 (MCL 339.602) & adds art. 26A.
Title
Occupations; appraisers; appraisal management companies; regulate. Amends sec. 602 of 1980 PA 299 (MCL 339.602) & adds art. 26A.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 846 (Y: 105 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 939 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 156 (Y: 105 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Banking And Financial Services (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 939 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 156 (Y: 105 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Banking And Financial Services (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 505'12 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/28/2012 @ 4:22 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/27/2012 @ 5:16 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/27/2012 @ 11:18 Am 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-13 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-13 | House | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2012-12-13 | House | Roll Call # 846 Yeas 105 Nays 4 |
2012-12-13 | House | Senate Substitute S-3 Concurred In |
2012-12-13 | House | Rule Suspended |
2012-12-13 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2012-12-13 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-3 With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 939 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Substitute S-3 Adopted |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-06-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2012-06-12 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-06-12 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-04-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Banking And Financial Institutions |
2012-03-29 | House | Transmitted |
2012-03-29 | House | Passed Roll Call # 156 Yeas 105 Nays 5 |
2012-03-29 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-03-28 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-03-28 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2012-03-28 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-03-21 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-03-21 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2011-10-05 | House | Recommendation Concurred In |
2011-10-05 | House | Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Banking And Financial Services |
2011-09-15 | House | Printed Bill Filed 09/15/2011 |
2011-09-14 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2011-09-14 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-09-14 | House | Introduced By Representative Margaret O'brien |
Subjects
Consumer credit, unfair trade practices
Financial institutions, mortgage brokers and lenders
Occupations, appraisers
Financial institutions, mortgage brokers and lenders
Occupations, appraisers