MI HB4959 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-6)
Status: Introduced on October 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-28 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-28 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Corrections; alternatives; restrict placement of youth under 18 during confinement, trial, or transport; prohibit placement with adults during confinement, trial, or transport. Amends sec. 139 of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.139). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4957'15, HB 4958'15
Title
Corrections; alternatives; restrict placement of youth under 18 during confinement, trial, or transport; prohibit placement with adults during confinement, trial, or transport. Amends sec. 139 of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.139). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4957'15, HB 4958'15
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-27 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 195 (Y: 92 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2016-04-27 | House | Transmitted |
2016-04-27 | House | Passed Roll Call # 195 Yeas 92 Nays 16 |
2016-04-27 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-04-26 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-04-26 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted And Amended |
2016-04-26 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-02-16 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-02-16 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2015-10-08 | House | Printed Bill Filed 10/08/2015 |
2015-10-07 | House | Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice |
2015-10-07 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-10-07 | House | Introduced By Representative Kurt Heise |