MI HB4940 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-16 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy
Pending: Senate Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-16 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy
Pending: Senate Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Health; other; reuse of certain medical equipment and supplies; prohibit, and provide penalty. Amends 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.1101 - 333.25211) by adding sec. 20153.
Title
Health; other; reuse of certain medical equipment and supplies; prohibit, and provide penalty. Amends 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.1101 - 333.25211) by adding sec. 20153.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-16 | Referred To Committee On Health Policy | |
2009-06-11 | Transmitted | |
2009-06-11 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 290 Yeas 108 Nays 0 | |
2009-06-11 | Read A Third Time | |
2009-06-11 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2009-06-11 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2009-06-11 | Substitute H-2 Adopted And Amended | |
2009-06-11 | Read A Second Time | |
2009-06-02 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2009-06-02 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 | |
2009-05-14 | Printed Bill Filed 05/14/2009 | |
2009-05-13 | Referred To Committee On Health Policy | |
2009-05-13 | Read A First Time | |
2009-05-13 | Introduced By Representative Dian Slavens |
Subjects
Crimes, fraud
Crimes, other
Crimes, penalties
Health facilities, patient safety
Health, occupations
Health, other
Occupations, health care professions
Crimes, other
Crimes, penalties
Health facilities, patient safety
Health, occupations
Health, other
Occupations, health care professions