MI HB4926 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-14 - Assigned Pa 194'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-14 - Assigned Pa 194'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Property tax: local community stabilization share; calculation for eligible millage cap levied; modify. Amends secs. 5, 13 & 14 of 2014 PA 86 (MCL 123.1345 et seq.).
Title
Property tax: local community stabilization share; calculation for eligible millage cap levied; modify. Amends secs. 5, 13 & 14 of 2014 PA 86 (MCL 123.1345 et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-24 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 417 (Y: 96 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 324 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-10 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 42 (Y: 96 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 324 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-10 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 42 (Y: 96 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-14 | House | Assigned Pa 194'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-10-14 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/15/2020 12:00 Pm |
2020-10-14 | House | Approved By The Governor 10/15/2020 09:30 Am |
2020-10-01 | House | Presented To The Governor 10/01/2020 01:04 Pm |
2020-09-24 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2020-09-24 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-09-24 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 417 Yeas 96 Nays 9 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2020-09-24 | House | Senate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2020-09-24 | House | Rule Suspended |
2020-09-24 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2020-09-24 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 324 Yeas 36 Nays 1 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-09-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-09-10 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-09-10 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2020-02-05 | House | Transmitted |
2020-02-05 | House | Title Amended |
2020-02-05 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 42 Yeas 96 Nays 9 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2020-02-05 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-01-28 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-01-28 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2020-01-28 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-01-21 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-01-21 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2019-10-02 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2019-09-11 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/11/2019 |
2019-09-10 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2019-09-10 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-09-10 | House | Introduced By Representative Lynn Afendoulis |