MI HB4917 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-01 - Referred To Committee On Commerce
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-01 - Referred To Committee On Commerce
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Businesses; business corporations; late filing penalty for reports; modify. Amends sec. 921 of 1972 PA 284 (MCL 450.1921).
Title
Businesses; business corporations; late filing penalty for reports; modify. Amends sec. 921 of 1972 PA 284 (MCL 450.1921).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-26 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 255 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Commerce |
2018-04-26 | House | Transmitted |
2018-04-26 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 255 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2018-04-26 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-04-25 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-04-25 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-03-20 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-03-20 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-09-13 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/12/2017 |
2017-09-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Commerce And Trade |
2017-09-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-09-12 | House | Introduced By Representative Martin Howrylak |