MI HB4782 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Passed on December 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-16 - Placed On Order Of Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Passed on December 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-16 - Placed On Order Of Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Economic development; other; next Michigan development act; modify. Amends sec. 4 of 2010 PA 275 (MCL 125.2954).
Title
Economic development; other; next Michigan development act; modify. Amends sec. 4 of 2010 PA 275 (MCL 125.2954).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-12-12 - House - House Third Reading: Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 504 (Y: 86 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 590 (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-12-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 430 (Y: 87 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 590 (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-12-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 430 (Y: 87 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-16 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2014-12-16 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2013-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 239'13 With Immediate Effect 2013 Addenda |
2013-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/26/2013 @ 1:40 Pm 2013 Addenda |
2013-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/21/2013 @ 4:48 Pm 2013 Addenda |
2013-12-31 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/17/2013 @ 2:32 Pm 2013 Addenda |
2013-12-12 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2013-12-12 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2013-12-12 | House | Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 504 Yeas 86 Nays 23 |
2013-12-11 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2013-12-11 | House | Returned From Senate With Amendment(s) With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2013-12-11 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2013-12-11 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 590 Yeas 31 Nays 6 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2013-12-10 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Amendment(s) |
2013-12-10 | Senate | Amendment(s) Concurred In |
2013-12-10 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Amendment(s) |
2013-12-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2013-12-05 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2013-12-05 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2013-12-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Economic Development |
2013-11-14 | House | Transmitted |
2013-11-14 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 430 Yeas 87 Nays 23 |
2013-11-14 | House | Read A Third Time |
2013-11-13 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2013-11-13 | House | Read A Second Time |
2013-11-06 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2013-11-06 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2013-05-30 | House | Printed Bill Filed 05/30/2013 |
2013-05-29 | House | Referred To Committee On Commerce |
2013-05-29 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-05-29 | House | Introduced By Representative John Kivela |
Same As/Similar To
SB0398 (Same As) 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0446'14 With Immediate Effect