MI SB0398 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0446'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Economic development; other; next Michigan development act; modify. Amends sec. 4 of 2010 PA 275 (MCL 125.2954).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Economic development; other; next Michigan development act; modify. Amends sec. 4 of 2010 PA 275 (MCL 125.2954).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 863 (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 706 (Y: 81 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 375 (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-09-19 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-12-31SenateAssigned Pa 0446'14 With Immediate Effect
2014-12-31SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 1/2/2015 @ 2:42 Pm
2014-12-31SenateApproved By Governor 12/27/2014 @ 8:54 Pm 2014 Addenda
2014-12-30SenatePresented To Governor 12/26/2014 @ 10:52 Am
2014-12-18SenateOrdered Enrolled
2014-12-18SenateTitle Amendment Agreed To
2014-12-18SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2014-12-18Senate Roll Call # 863 Yeas 33 Nays 5 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2014-12-18SenateHouse Substitute H-2 Concurred In
2014-12-18HouseReturned To Senate
2014-12-18HouseTitle Amended
2014-12-18HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 706 Yeas 81 Nays 28
2014-12-18HouseRead A Third Time
2014-08-27HousePlaced On Third Reading
2014-08-27HouseSubstitute H-2 Adopted
2014-08-27HouseRead A Second Time
2014-06-11HouseReferred To Second Reading
2014-06-11HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2
2013-09-26HouseReferred To Committee On Commerce
2013-09-26HouseRead A First Time
2013-09-26HouseReceived On 09/26/2013
2013-09-26SenatePassed Roll Call # 375 Yeas 33 Nays 4 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2013-09-25SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2013-09-25SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2013-09-19SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2013-09-19SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2013-09-19SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2013-05-29SenateReferred To Committee On Economic Development
2013-05-29SenateIntroduced By Senator Thomas Casperson

Same As/Similar To

HB4782 (Same As) 2014-12-16 - Placed On Order Of Third Reading

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2013-SB-0398
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2013-SIB-0398.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2013-SEBS-0398.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2013-SEBH-0398.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2013-SNB-0398.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/publicact/htm/2014-PA-0446.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/Journal/Senate/htm/2013-SJ-09-19-072.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/Journal/Senate/htm/2013-SJ-09-26-075.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/Journal/House/htm/2014-HJ-06-11-057.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/Journal/House/htm/2014-HJ-12-18-086.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/Journal/Senate/htm/2014-SJ-12-18-084.htm

Bill Comments

feedback