MI HB4771 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-03 - Referred To Committee On Environmental Quality
Pending: Senate Environmental Quality Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-03 - Referred To Committee On Environmental Quality
Pending: Senate Environmental Quality Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Labor: health and safety; provisions related to civil penalties; modify with respect to repeated violations and asbestos-related violations. Amends secs. 4, 35 & 36 of 1974 PA 154 (MCL 408.1004 et seq.).
Title
Labor: health and safety; provisions related to civil penalties; modify with respect to repeated violations and asbestos-related violations. Amends secs. 4, 35 & 36 of 1974 PA 154 (MCL 408.1004 et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-02 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 517 (Y: 88 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Environmental Quality |
2021-11-02 | House | Transmitted |
2021-11-02 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 517 Yeas 88 Nays 14 Excused 0 Not Voting 7 |
2021-11-02 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-10-27 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-10-27 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2021-10-27 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-05-27 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-05-27 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2021-05-05 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/04/2021 |
2021-05-04 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources And Outdoor Recreation |
2021-05-04 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-05-04 | House | Introduced By Representative William Sowerby |