MI HB4738 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 31 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-09-10 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 31 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-09-10 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Juveniles; criminal procedure; restitution of certain cost incurred by victims of identity theft; amend probate code of 1939 to require. Amends secs. 30 & 31, ch. XIIA of 1939 PA 288 (MCL 712A.30 & 712A.31). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4736'09, HB 4737'09
Title
Juveniles; criminal procedure; restitution of certain cost incurred by victims of identity theft; amend probate code of 1939 to require. Amends secs. 30 & 31, ch. XIIA of 1939 PA 288 (MCL 712A.30 & 712A.31). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4736'09, HB 4737'09
Sponsors
Rep. Terry Brown [D] | Rep. Robert Dean [D] | Rep. Fred Durhal [D] | Rep. Gabe Leland [D] |
Rep. Mark Meadows [D] | Rep. Tim Melton [D] | Rep. Joel Sheltrown [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-09-10 | Referred To Committee On Judiciary | |
2009-09-09 | Transmitted | |
2009-09-09 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 417 Yeas 108 Nays 0 | |
2009-09-09 | Read A Third Time | |
2009-09-09 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2009-09-09 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2009-09-09 | Amended | |
2009-09-09 | Read A Second Time | |
2009-07-15 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2009-07-15 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment(s) | |
2009-04-01 | Printed Bill Filed 04/01/2009 | |
2009-03-31 | Referred To Committee On Judiciary | |
2009-03-31 | Read A First Time | |
2009-03-31 | Introduced By Representative Terry Brown |