MI HB4718 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-24 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-24 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Weapons: licensing; license to carry a concealed pistol; modify requirement to file in county of residence. Amends secs. 5b & 5l of 1927 PA 372 (MCL 28.425b & 28.425l).
Title
Weapons: licensing; license to carry a concealed pistol; modify requirement to file in county of residence. Amends secs. 5b & 5l of 1927 PA 372 (MCL 28.425b & 28.425l).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-23 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 360 (Y: 77 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2021-06-23 | House | Transmitted |
2021-06-23 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 360 Yeas 77 Nays 33 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2021-06-23 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-06-22 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-06-22 | House | Substitute (h-3) Adopted |
2021-06-22 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-06-08 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-06-08 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-3) |
2021-04-28 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/27/2021 |
2021-04-27 | House | Referred To Committee On Military, Veterans And Homeland Security |
2021-04-27 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-04-27 | House | Introduced By Representative Gary Eisen |