MI HB4703 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-15 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-15 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Crimes: animals; restitution for care and treatment of certain forfeited animals; impose penalty on ownership of animal to person convicted of certain crimes against animal. Amends sec. 50b of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.50b).
Title
Crimes: animals; restitution for care and treatment of certain forfeited animals; impose penalty on ownership of animal to person convicted of certain crimes against animal. Amends sec. 50b of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.50b).
Sponsors
Rep. Douglas Wozniak [R] | Rep. Robert Bezotte [R] | Rep. Samantha Steckloff [D] | Rep. Padma Kuppa [D] |
Rep. Jeffrey Yaroch [R] | Rep. Karen Whitsett [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-10 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 551 (Y: 91 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-10 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 551 (Y: 91 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2021-11-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety |
2021-11-10 | House | Transmitted |
2021-11-10 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 551 Yeas 91 Nays 14 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2021-11-10 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-11-09 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-11-09 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2021-11-09 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-10-26 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-10-26 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2021-04-27 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/22/2021 |
2021-04-22 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2021-04-22 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-04-22 | House | Introduced By Representative Douglas Wozniak |