MI HB4578 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-3)
Status: Passed on March 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-08 - Assigned Pa 41'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-3)
Status: Passed on March 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-08 - Assigned Pa 41'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Environmental protection; sewage; land application of septage waste; preempt certain local restrictions. Amends sec. 11715 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.11715).
Title
Environmental protection; sewage; land application of septage waste; preempt certain local restrictions. Amends sec. 11715 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.11715).
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Goike [R] | Sen. Ricky Outman [R] | Rep. Earl Poleski [R] | Rep. Paul Muxlow [R] |
Rep. Joe Haveman [R] | Rep. Andrea LaFontaine [R] | Rep. Frank Foster [R] | Rep. Kurt Damrow [R] |
Rep. Eileen Kowall [R] | Rep. Anthony Forlini [R] | Sen. Jon Bumstead [R] | Sen. Kevin Daley [R] |
Rep. David Agema [R] | Sen. Kenneth Horn [R] | Rep. Lesia Liss [D] | Rep. Marilyn Lane [D] |
Rep. Ben Glardon [R] | Rep. Peter Pettalia [R] | Rep. Matt Huuki [R] | Rep. Philip Potvin [R] |
Rep. Mark Meadows [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 96 (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 92 (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-04 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 376 (Y: 69 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 92 (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-04 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 376 (Y: 69 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | House | Assigned Pa 41'12 With Immediate Effect |
2012-03-08 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 3/6/2012 @ 4:20 Pm |
2012-03-08 | House | Approved By The Governor 3/6/2012 @ 9:08 Am |
2012-02-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 2/28/2012 @ 2:03 Pm |
2012-02-22 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2012-02-22 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-02-22 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2012-02-22 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 96 Yeas 24 Nays 14 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-02-22 | Senate | Vote Reconsidered |
2012-02-22 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2012-02-22 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 92 Yeas 25 Nays 12 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2012-02-21 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2012-02-21 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2011-10-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources, Environment And Great Lakes |
2011-10-04 | House | Transmitted |
2011-10-04 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 376 Yeas 69 Nays 40 |
2011-10-04 | House | Read A Third Time |
2011-09-28 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2011-09-28 | House | Read A Second Time |
2011-09-13 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2011-09-13 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2011-04-26 | House | Printed Bill Filed 04/22/2011 |
2011-04-21 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources, Tourism, And Outdoor Recreation |
2011-04-21 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-04-21 | House | Introduced By Representative Ken Goike |