MI HB4528 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy
Pending: Senate Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy
Pending: Senate Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Health occupations; health professionals; eligibility to participate in the health professional recovery program; expand to include emergency medical services personnel. Amends secs. 16105a, 16167, 16169, 16170, 16170a & 20910 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.16105a et seq.).
Title
Health occupations; health professionals; eligibility to participate in the health professional recovery program; expand to include emergency medical services personnel. Amends secs. 16105a, 16167, 16169, 16170, 16170a & 20910 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.16105a et seq.).
Sponsors
Rep. Henry Yanez [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-07 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 52 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2018-02-07 | House | Transmitted |
2018-02-07 | House | Title Amended |
2018-02-07 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 52 Yeas 107 Nays 1 |
2018-02-07 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-02-06 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-02-06 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2018-02-06 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-01-31 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2017-04-26 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/25/2017 |
2017-04-25 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2017-04-25 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-04-25 | House | Introduced By Representative Henry Yanez |
Subjects
Health occupations: emergency medical services personnel
Health occupations: health professionals
Health: occupations
Health: substance use disorder treatment
Health occupations: health professionals
Health: occupations
Health: substance use disorder treatment