MI HB4463 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-27 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-27 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Civil procedure; evictions; limited liability companies; allow members and others with personal knowledge to represent in certain situations. Amends 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.101 - 600.9947) by adding sec. 5707.
Title
Civil procedure; evictions; limited liability companies; allow members and others with personal knowledge to represent in certain situations. Amends 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.101 - 600.9947) by adding sec. 5707.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-26 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 280 (Y: 64 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2017-09-26 | House | Transmitted |
2017-09-26 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 280 Yeas 64 Nays 43 |
2017-09-26 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-09-20 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-09-20 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2017-09-20 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-05-30 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-05-30 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2017-04-19 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/30/2017 |
2017-03-30 | House | Referred To Committee On Law And Justice |
2017-03-30 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-03-30 | House | Introduced By Representative Scott Vansingel |