MI HB4421 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - Assigned Pa 47'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriations: school aid; multisection school aid supplemental for fiscal year 2021-2022; provide for. Amends secs. 11, 11n, 11r & 23b of 1979 PA 94 (MCL 388.1611 et seq.) & adds sec. 11o.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriations: school aid; multisection school aid supplemental for fiscal year 2021-2022; provide for. Amends secs. 11, 11n, 11r & 23b of 1979 PA 94 (MCL 388.1611 et seq.) & adds sec. 11o.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-24 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 397 (Y: 105 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 270 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 180 (Y: 96 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 17 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-01HouseAssigned Pa 47'21 With Immediate Effect
2021-07-01HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 07/07/2021 04:36 Pm
2021-07-01HouseApproved By The Governor 07/07/2021 10:47 Am
2021-06-30HousePresented To The Governor 06/30/2021 01:38 Pm
2021-06-24HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2021-06-24HouseTitle Amendment Agreed To
2021-06-24HouseRoll Call Roll Call # 397 Yeas 105 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
2021-06-24HouseSenate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
2021-06-17HousePostponed Temporarily
2021-06-15HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2021-06-15HouseReturned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment
2021-06-15SenateTitle Amended
2021-06-15SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 270 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2021-06-15SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2021-06-15SenateRules Suspended
2021-06-15SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
2021-06-15SenateSubstitute (s-1) Concurred In
2021-06-15SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2021-05-12SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2021-05-12SenateRules Suspended
2021-05-11HouseTransmitted
2021-05-11HouseTitle Amended
2021-05-11HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 180 Yeas 96 Nays 11 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
2021-05-11HouseRead A Third Time
2021-05-11HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2021-05-11HousePlaced On Third Reading
2021-05-11HouseSubstitute (h-2) Adopted And Amended
2021-05-11HouseRead A Second Time
2021-04-28HouseReferred To Second Reading
2021-04-28HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2)
2021-03-03HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 03/02/2021
2021-03-02HouseReferred To Committee On Appropriations
2021-03-02HouseRead A First Time
2021-03-02HouseIntroduced By Representative Brad Paquette

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2021-HB-4421
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billintroduced/House/htm/2021-HIB-4421.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/House/htm/2021-HEBH-4421.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/House/htm/2021-HEBS-4421.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billenrolled/House/htm/2021-HNB-4421.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/publicact/htm/2021-PA-0047.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2021-HCVBS-4421-0N295.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2021-HCVBS-4421-00C719.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4421-92A19053.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4421-62194CEB.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4421-92D76213.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4421-8123705F.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-4421-F.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4421-1EC13136.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-4421-N.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4421-AAD05827.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-04-28-036.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-05-11-041.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2021-SJ-06-15-055.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-06-24-061.htm

Bill Comments 750

feedback