MI HB4389 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on October 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-08 - Assigned Pa 136'15 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on October 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-08 - Assigned Pa 136'15 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Highways; name; portion of US-12; designate as the "Tpr. Steven B. Devries Memorial Highway". Amends 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1001 - 250.2080) by adding sec. 4a.
Title
Highways; name; portion of US-12; designate as the "Tpr. Steven B. Devries Memorial Highway". Amends 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1001 - 250.2080) by adding sec. 4a.
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Pagel [R] | Sen. Roger Victory [R] | Rep. Brett Roberts [R] | Rep. Alton Pscholka [R] |
Rep. Tim Kelly [R] | Rep. Amanda Price [R] | Rep. David Maturen [R] | Rep. Pam Faris [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-09-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 377 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 129 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 129 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-08 | House | Assigned Pa 136'15 With Immediate Effect |
2015-10-08 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/7/2015 @ 4:36 Pm |
2015-10-08 | House | Approved By The Governor 10/6/2015 @ 4:02 Pm |
2015-10-06 | House | Presented To The Governor 10/1/2015 @ 1:55 Pm |
2015-09-29 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2015-09-29 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2015-09-29 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 377 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 3 Not Voting 0 |
2015-09-17 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2015-09-17 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2015-07-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2015-07-15 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2015-07-15 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2015-05-07 | House | Transmitted |
2015-05-07 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 129 Yeas 110 Nays 0 |
2015-05-07 | House | Read A Third Time |
2015-05-05 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2015-05-05 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2015-05-05 | House | Read A Second Time |
2015-04-28 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2015-04-28 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2015-03-26 | House | Printed Bill Filed 03/26/2015 |
2015-03-25 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2015-03-25 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-03-25 | House | Introduced By Representative Dave Pagel |