MI HB4378 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-08 - Printed Bill Filed 03/04/2011
Pending: House Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-08 - Printed Bill Filed 03/04/2011
Pending: House Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Liquor; licenses; "catering permit" for on-premises licensees to serve alcohol at locations other than the licensed premises under certain circumstances; provide for. Amends 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1101 - 436.2303) by adding sec. 547.
Title
Liquor; licenses; "catering permit" for on-premises licensees to serve alcohol at locations other than the licensed premises under certain circumstances; provide for. Amends 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1101 - 436.2303) by adding sec. 547.
Sponsors
Rep. Judson Gilbert [R] | Sen. Kenneth Horn [R] | Rep. Lisa Lyons [R] | Rep. Bruce Rendon [R] |
Rep. Ken Yonker [R] | Rep. Holly Hughes [R] | Sen. Michael Shirkey [R] | Rep. Frank Foster [R] |
Sen. Jeff Irwin [D] | Rep. Roy Schmidt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-08 | House | Printed Bill Filed 03/04/2011 |
2011-03-03 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2011-03-03 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-03-03 | House | Introduced By Representative Jud Gilbert |
Same As/Similar To
SB0005 (Same As) 2011-04-26 - Assigned Pa 0020'11 With Immediate Effect
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2011-HB-4378 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billintroduced/House/htm/2011-HIB-4378.htm |