MI SB0005 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Assigned Pa 0020'11 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Assigned Pa 0020'11 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Liquor; licenses; "catering permit" for specially designated distributors, specially designated merchants, and on-premises licensees to serve alcohol at locations other than the licensed premises under certain circumstances; provide for. Amends 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1101 - 436.2303) by adding sec. 547.
Title
Liquor; licenses; "catering permit" for specially designated distributors, specially designated merchants, and on-premises licensees to serve alcohol at locations other than the licensed premises under certain circumstances; provide for. Amends 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1101 - 436.2303) by adding sec. 547.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 68 (Y: 107 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 76 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 76 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-26 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0020'11 With Immediate Effect |
2011-04-26 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 4/20/2011 @ 1:40 Pm |
2011-04-26 | Senate | Approved By Governor 4/19/2011 @ 3:16 Pm |
2011-04-26 | Senate | Presented To Governor 4/18/2011 @ 11:10 Am |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2011-04-12 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2011-03-24 | House | Returned To Senate |
2011-03-24 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2011-03-24 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 68 Yeas 107 Nays 3 |
2011-03-24 | House | Read A Third Time |
2011-03-23 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2011-03-23 | House | Read A Second Time |
2011-03-23 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2011-03-23 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2011-03-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2011-03-17 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-03-17 | House | Received On 03/17/2011 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 76 Yeas 37 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Amendment(s) Adopted |
2011-03-15 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2011-03-15 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2011-03-15 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2011-03-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2011-03-15 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2011-03-15 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2011-01-19 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
Same As/Similar To
HB4378 (Same As) 2011-03-08 - Printed Bill Filed 03/04/2011