MI HB4370 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on November 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-10 - Assigned Pa 179'15
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on November 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-10 - Assigned Pa 179'15
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Individual income tax; property tax credit; transportation earmark, property tax credit caps, and credit amount; provide for and increase. Amends secs. 520 & 522 of 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.520 & 206.522) & adds sec. 51d. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4614'15, HB 4616'15, HB 4736'15, HB 4737'15, HB 4738'15, SB 0414'15
Title
Individual income tax; property tax credit; transportation earmark, property tax credit caps, and credit amount; provide for and increase. Amends secs. 520 & 522 of 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.520 & 206.522) & adds sec. 51d. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4614'15, HB 4616'15, HB 4736'15, HB 4737'15, HB 4738'15, SB 0414'15
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-11-03 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 408 (Y: 62 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 478 (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-21 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 376 (Y: 62 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 478 (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-21 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 376 (Y: 62 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-10 | House | Assigned Pa 179'15 |
2015-11-10 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 11/10/2015 @ 2:18 Pm |
2015-11-10 | House | Approved By The Governor 11/10/2015 @ 12:52 Pm |
2015-11-10 | House | Presented To The Governor 11/9/2015 @ 10:20 Am |
2015-11-03 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2015-11-03 | House | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2015-11-03 | House | Roll Call # 408 Yeas 62 Nays 45 |
2015-11-03 | House | Senate Substitute S-3 Concurred In |
2015-11-03 | House | Rule Suspended |
2015-11-03 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2015-11-03 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-3 With Title Amendment |
2015-11-03 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2015-11-03 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 478 Yeas 28 Nays 10 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2015-11-03 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2015-11-03 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2015-11-03 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-3 |
2015-11-03 | Senate | Substitute S-3 Concurred In |
2015-11-03 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-3 |
2015-10-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2015-10-27 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2015-10-21 | House | Transmitted |
2015-10-21 | House | Title Amended |
2015-10-21 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 376 Yeas 62 Nays 44 |
2015-10-21 | House | Read A Third Time |
2015-10-21 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2015-10-21 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2015-10-21 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted And Amended |
2015-10-21 | House | Read A Second Time |
2015-10-21 | House | Placed On Second Reading |
2015-10-21 | House | Motion To Discharge Committee Approved |
2015-10-21 | House | Rule Suspended |
2015-03-25 | House | Printed Bill Filed 03/25/2015 |
2015-03-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2015-03-24 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-03-24 | House | Introduced By Representative Holly Hughes |