MI HB4367 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Assigned Pa 39'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Assigned Pa 39'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health: other; administration of opioid antagonists act; create. Creates new act & repeals 2014 PA 462 (MCL 28.541 - 28.544). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0200'19, SB 0282'19, SB 0283'19
Title
Health: other; administration of opioid antagonists act; create. Creates new act & repeals 2014 PA 462 (MCL 28.541 - 28.544). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0200'19, SB 0282'19, SB 0283'19
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 123 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 134 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 34 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 134 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 34 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | House | Assigned Pa 39'19 With Immediate Effect |
2019-07-02 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 06/26/2019 03:30 Pm |
2019-07-02 | House | Approved By The Governor 06/26/2019 01:41 Pm |
2019-07-02 | House | Presented To The Governor 06/20/2019 03:40 Pm |
2019-06-13 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2019-06-13 | House | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2019-06-13 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 123 Yeas 109 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2019-06-13 | House | Senate Substitute (s-3) Concurred In |
2019-06-12 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2019-06-12 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-3) With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 134 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Substitute (s-3) Adopted |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2) |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Substitute (s-2) Concurred In |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-2) |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services |
2019-03-20 | House | Transmitted |
2019-03-20 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 34 Yeas 106 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2019-03-20 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-03-19 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-03-19 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-03-19 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-03-19 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2019-03-19 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/14/2019 |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2019-03-14 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-03-14 | House | Introduced By Representative Jason Sheppard |
Subjects
Controlled substances: narcotic drugs
Health: other
Health: pharmaceuticals
Libraries: other
Local government: other
State: other
Health: other
Health: pharmaceuticals
Libraries: other
Local government: other
State: other