MI HB4329 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Assigned Pa 33'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Assigned Pa 33'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriations; zero budget; supplemental appropriations; provide for fiscal year 2016-2017. Creates appropriation act.
Title
Appropriations; zero budget; supplemental appropriations; provide for fiscal year 2016-2017. Creates appropriation act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - House - House Third Reading: Senate Amendment(s) To House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 76 (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 118 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 114 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 62 (Y: 101 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 100 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 55 (Y: 101 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 118 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 114 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 62 (Y: 101 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 100 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 55 (Y: 101 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | House | Assigned Pa 33'17 With Immediate Effect |
2017-05-11 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 5/9/2017 @ 4:20 Pm |
2017-05-11 | House | Approved By The Governor 5/8/2017 @ 4:31 Pm |
2017-05-02 | House | Presented To The Governor 5/2/2017 @ 11:02 Am |
2017-04-27 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2017-04-27 | House | Senate Amendment(s) To House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 76 Yeas 108 Nays 1 |
2017-04-27 | House | Rule Suspended |
2017-04-27 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2017-04-27 | House | Re-returned From Senate With Amendment(s) To House Amendment(s) |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Roll Call # 118 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | House Amendment(s) To Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In As Amended |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Amendment(s) Adopted |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Vote Reconsidered |
2017-04-26 | House | House Requests Return |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Roll Call # 114 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | House Amendment(s) To Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In As Amended |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Amendment(s) Adopted |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Returned From House With Amendment(s) To Senate Substitute S-1 |
2017-03-30 | House | Retransmitted |
2017-03-30 | House | Roll Call # 62 Yeas 101 Nays 7 |
2017-03-30 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In As Amended |
2017-03-30 | House | Amended |
2017-03-30 | House | Rule Suspended |
2017-03-30 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2017-03-30 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 100 Yeas 36 Nays 1 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Amendment(s) Defeated |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 As Amended |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Substitute S-1 As Amended Concurred In |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2017-03-22 | House | Transmitted |
2017-03-22 | House | Title Amended |
2017-03-22 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 55 Yeas 101 Nays 7 |
2017-03-22 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-03-22 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2017-03-22 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-03-22 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-03-22 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2017-03-08 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/07/2017 |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2017-03-07 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced By Representative Jeff Yaroch |