MI HB4322 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-24 - Printed Bill Filed 02/24/2011
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-24 - Printed Bill Filed 02/24/2011
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure; evidence; electronic recording of certain custodial interrogation sessions; require, and revise procedures for determining admissibility as evidence. Amends 1927 PA 175 (MCL 760.1 - 777.69) by adding secs. 7, 8, 9, 10 & 11 to ch. III.
Title
Criminal procedure; evidence; electronic recording of certain custodial interrogation sessions; require, and revise procedures for determining admissibility as evidence. Amends 1927 PA 175 (MCL 760.1 - 777.69) by adding secs. 7, 8, 9, 10 & 11 to ch. III.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-24 | House | Printed Bill Filed 02/24/2011 |
2011-02-23 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2011-02-23 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-02-23 | House | Introduced By Representative Rashida Tlaib |
Same As/Similar To
SB0152 (Same As) 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0479'12
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2011-HB-4322 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billintroduced/House/htm/2011-HIB-4322.htm |