MI HB4320 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety
Pending: Senate Judiciary And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Health; abortion; partial-birth abortion provision; modify to include dismemberment abortion. Amends sec. 90h of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.90h).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health; abortion; partial-birth abortion provision; modify to include dismemberment abortion. Amends sec. 90h of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.90h).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 85 (Y: 58 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Judiciary (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16SenateReferred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety
2019-05-14HouseTransmitted
2019-05-14HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 85 Yeas 58 Nays 51 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
2019-05-14HouseRead A Third Time
2019-05-14HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2019-05-14HousePlaced On Third Reading
2019-05-14HouseRead A Second Time
2019-05-07HouseReferred To Second Reading
2019-05-07HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2019-05-01HouseReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2019-03-13HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 03/12/2019
2019-03-12HouseReferred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors
2019-03-12HouseRead A First Time
2019-03-12HouseIntroduced By Representative Pamela Hornberger

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback