MI HB4318 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-18 - Referred To Committee On Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-18 - Referred To Committee On Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Education; curriculum; mathematics requirement for Michigan merit curriculum; revise. Amends sec. 1278a of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1278a).
Title
Education; curriculum; mathematics requirement for Michigan merit curriculum; revise. Amends sec. 1278a of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1278a).
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Howell [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 68 (Y: 91 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Education |
2017-03-30 | House | Transmitted |
2017-03-30 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 68 Yeas 91 Nays 17 |
2017-03-30 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-03-29 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-03-28 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-03-28 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-03-08 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/07/2017 |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred To Committee On Workforce And Talent Development |
2017-03-07 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced By Representative Gary Howell |