MI HB4300 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-27 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-27 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Children; protection; videorecorded statements; allow to be used in child protective services hearings, increase fines for improper release of, and require to be retained for certain period of time. Amends sec. 17b, ch. XIIA of 1939 PA 288 (MCL 712A.17b). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4298'17, HB 4299'17
Title
Children; protection; videorecorded statements; allow to be used in child protective services hearings, increase fines for improper release of, and require to be retained for certain period of time. Amends sec. 17b, ch. XIIA of 1939 PA 288 (MCL 712A.17b). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4298'17, HB 4299'17
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-21 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 90 (Y: 93 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-6 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-6 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2018-02-21 | House | Transmitted |
2018-02-21 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 90 Yeas 93 Nays 16 |
2018-02-21 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-02-14 | House | Substitute H-6 Adopted |
2018-02-14 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-01-30 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-01-30 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-6 |
2017-07-12 | House | Re-referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2017-06-20 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-06-20 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2017-03-07 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/02/2017 |
2017-03-02 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2017-03-02 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-03-02 | House | Introduced By Representative Pamela Hornberger |