MI HB4264 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-08 - Vetoed By The Governor 12/22/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-08 - Vetoed By The Governor 12/22/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Retirement: state employees; method to calculate unfunded actuarial liability; revise. Amends secs. 7, 20g, 38, 49 & 68b of 1943 PA 240 (MCL 38.7 et seq.).
Title
Retirement: state employees; method to calculate unfunded actuarial liability; revise. Amends secs. 7, 20g, 38, 49 & 68b of 1943 PA 240 (MCL 38.7 et seq.).
Sponsors
Rep. Steven Johnson [R] | Sen. Thomas Albert [R] | Rep. Ann Bollin [R] | Rep. Scott VanSingel [R] |
Sen. Joseph Bellino [R] | Rep. Douglas Wozniak [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 121 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 121 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-08 | House | Vetoed By The Governor 12/22/2022 |
2022-12-08 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/13/2022 11:02 Am |
2022-12-06 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2022-12-06 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2022-12-06 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 474 Yeas 102 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 7 |
2022-12-06 | House | Senate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2022-11-30 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2022-11-30 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 491 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2022-11-29 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2021-04-20 | House | Transmitted |
2021-04-20 | House | Title Amended |
2021-04-20 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 121 Yeas 108 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2021-04-20 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-04-15 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-04-15 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2021-04-15 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-03-24 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-03-24 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) |
2021-02-23 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/18/2021 |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2021-02-18 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-02-18 | House | Introduced By Representative Steven Johnson |