MI HB4239 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Approved By The Governor 09/29/2019 03:39 Pm
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Approved By The Governor 09/29/2019 03:39 Pm
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriations: licensing and regulatory affairs; department of licensing and regulatory affairs; provide for fiscal year 2019-2020. Creates appropriation act.
Title
Appropriations: licensing and regulatory affairs; department of licensing and regulatory affairs; provide for fiscal year 2019-2020. Creates appropriation act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Senate Adopted Conference Report With Immediate Effect Roll Call # 227 (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-24 - House - House Third Reading: Conference Report Adopted Roll Call # 228 (Y: 72 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 141 (Y: 0 N: 109 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 148 (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 147 (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 118 (Y: 58 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-24 - House - House Third Reading: Conference Report Adopted Roll Call # 228 (Y: 72 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 141 (Y: 0 N: 109 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 148 (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 147 (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 118 (Y: 58 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-02 | House | Approved By The Governor 09/29/2019 03:39 Pm |
2019-10-02 | House | Assigned Pa 60'19 |
2019-10-02 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 09/30/2019 07:26 Pm |
2019-09-26 | House | Presented To The Governor 09/27/2019 11:25 Am |
2019-09-24 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2019-09-24 | House | Conference Report Adopted By Senate With Immediate Effect |
2019-09-24 | Senate | Senate Adopted Conference Report With Immediate Effect Roll Call # 227 Yeas 25 Nays 13 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2019-09-24 | Senate | Conference Report Received In Senate |
2019-09-24 | House | Retransmitted |
2019-09-24 | House | Given Immediate Effect |
2019-09-24 | House | Conference Report Adopted Roll Call # 228 Yeas 72 Nays 36 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2019-09-24 | House | Conference Report Received |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Senate Named Conferees 06/20/2019: Sens. Aric Nesbitt, Jim Stamas, Sylvia A Santana |
2019-06-19 | House | House Conferees Named 06/19/2019: Reps. Jeff Yaroch Annette Glenn Ronnie D Peterson |
2019-06-19 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 141 Yeas 0 Nays 109 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2019-06-19 | House | Senate Substitute (s-1) Nonconcurred In |
2019-06-18 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2019-06-18 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 147 Yeas 23 Nays 13 Excused 1 Not Voting 1 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Vote Reconsidered |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 147 Yeas 23 Nays 13 Excused 1 Not Voting 1 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2019-06-12 | House | Transmitted |
2019-06-12 | House | Passed Roll Call # 118 Yeas 58 Nays 49 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2019-06-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-06-12 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2019-06-12 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-06-12 | House | Substitute (h-3) Adopted |
2019-06-12 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-05-14 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-05-14 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-3) |
2019-02-26 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/26/2019 |
2019-02-26 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2019-02-26 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-02-26 | House | Introduced By Representative Jeff Yaroch |