MI HB4203 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Assigned Pa 46'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Assigned Pa 46'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Sales tax: exemptions; exemption for prosthetic devices; modify definition. Amends sec. 1a of 1933 PA 167 (MCL 205.51a) & adds sec. 4ff.
Title
Sales tax: exemptions; exemption for prosthetic devices; modify definition. Amends sec. 1a of 1933 PA 167 (MCL 205.51a) & adds sec. 4ff.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 65 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-11 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 352 (Y: 72 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-11 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 352 (Y: 72 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Assigned Pa 46'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-03-04 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 03/03/2020 04:04 Pm |
2020-03-04 | House | Approved By The Governor 03/03/2020 12:39 Pm |
2020-02-20 | House | Presented To The Governor 02/24/2020 11:46 Am |
2020-02-18 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2020-02-18 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-02-18 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 65 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Amendment(s) Defeated |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2019-12-11 | House | Transmitted |
2019-12-11 | House | Title Amended |
2019-12-11 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 352 Yeas 72 Nays 35 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2019-12-11 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-12-10 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-12-10 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2019-12-10 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-12-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-12-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) |
2019-09-04 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-2) |
2019-02-19 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/19/2019 |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2019-02-19 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-02-19 | House | Introduced By Representative Lynn Afendoulis |