MI HB4154 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-6)
Status: Engrossed on November 2 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-11-07 - Referred To Committee On Veterans And Emergency Services
Pending: Senate Veterans And Emergency Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 2 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-11-07 - Referred To Committee On Veterans And Emergency Services
Pending: Senate Veterans And Emergency Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Highways: memorial; portion of M-3; designate as the "Senior Chief Petty Officer Jason P. May Memorial Highway". Amends sec. 92 of 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1092).
Title
Highways: memorial; portion of M-3; designate as the "Senior Chief Petty Officer Jason P. May Memorial Highway". Amends sec. 92 of 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1092).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-11-02 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 474 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Veterans And Emergency Services |
2023-11-02 | House | Transmitted |
2023-11-02 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 474 Yeas 109 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2023-11-02 | House | Read A Third Time |
2023-11-01 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2023-11-01 | House | Read A Second Time |
2023-05-23 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2023-05-23 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2023-03-01 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/28/2023 |
2023-02-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation, Mobility And Infrastructure |
2023-02-28 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-02-28 | House | Introduced By Representative Jay Deboyer |